+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On September 16, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On September 13, 1985 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On September 12, 1985 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On July 10, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On June 5, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 9, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, Customs, USDA, ITC, USTR.
On April 15, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On April 1, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
On March 25, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On March 20, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor