+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-16.
- Signed by President.
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1626 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Weiner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.