+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 315.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3880-3883)
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-279.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 206.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1621.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3892)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 12 (Roll no. 83).(text: CR H3880)
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 12 (Roll no. 83). (text: CR H3880)
On November 17, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Introduced in House