+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On March 31, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Monopolies and Commercial Law.
On March 27, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Government Information, Justice, and Agriculture.
On March 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On March 19, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Competitiveness.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On March 12, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor