+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On August 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor