+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, Financial Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor