+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On December 9, 2020 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7083-7084)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1570.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7083-7086)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2608)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (344)
Type:
Primary Sponsor