+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 16, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On July 15, 1991 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCloskey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 12, 1991 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services Discharged.
On January 31, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services.
On January 3, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor