+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 13, 1996 in the House:
- See H.R.3643 .
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- See H.R.2353 .
On June 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
On June 27, 1995 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 26, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 75.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 104-158 .
On June 15, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 0.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 15, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Veterans' Affairs.
On May 11, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care.
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor