+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 1981 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from HHS, Justice, Labor, State, Treasury.
On February 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Immigration, Refugees, and International Law.
On February 6, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Labor Standards.
On February 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Assistance and Unemployment Compensation.
On January 5, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor