+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 28, 2001 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-75.
- Signed by President.
On November 16, 2001 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 15, 2001 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.2155 Motion to table amendment SA 2155 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43.
- S.AMDT.2155 Amendment SA 2155 proposed by Senator Enzi. To foster innovation and technological advancement in the development of the Internet and electronic commerce, and to assist the States in simplifying their sales and use taxes.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On October 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204.
On October 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On October 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 16, 2001 in the House:
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-240 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 143.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate H.R. 1552 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On October 10, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 2, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 2001 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2155
To foster innovation and technological advancement in the development of the Internet and electronic commerce, and to assist the States in simplifying their sales and use taxes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor