+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 15, 1999 in the House:
- H.AMDT.463 On agreeing to the Sensenbrenner amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- Rule H. Res. 290 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 290 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1551 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 290 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable John E. Sununu to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.463 Amendment offered by Mr. Sensenbrenner. Amendment strikes the authorization for several research and development activities of the FAA that were authorized by H.R. 1000 , the Aviation and Investment and Reform Act for the 21st Century.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1551 .
- H.AMDT.464 Amendment offered by Mr. Traficant. An amendment to encourage the FAA to conduct research on the laser visual guidance landing system.
- H.AMDT.464 On agreeing to the Traficant amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- H.AMDT.465 Amendment offered by Mr. Traficant. Amendment requires that funds expended under the bill must be in conformance with the Buy American Act; expresses the sense of Congress that equipment and products purchased with funds made available under the bill should be American-made; and prohibits contracts or subcontracts to any person who intentionally affixes "Made in America" labels or other similar inscriptions to products not made in the United States.
- H.AMDT.465 On agreeing to the Traficant amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1551 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by voice vote.
On September 14, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 290 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1551 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
On July 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 129.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 106-223 .
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
+ − Amendments (3)
H.AMDT.463
Amendment strikes the authorization for several research and development activities of the FAA that were authorized by
H.AMDT.464
An amendment to encourage the FAA to conduct research on the laser visual guidance landing system.
H.AMDT.465
Amendment requires that funds expended under the bill must be in conformance with the Buy American Act; expresses the sense of Congress that equipment and products purchased with funds made available under the bill should be American-made; and prohibits contracts or subcontracts to any person who intentionally affixes "Made in America" labels or other similar inscriptions to products not made in the United States.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor