+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 13, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-503.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 31, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments to the Senate amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
- House agreed to Senate amendment with amendments pursuant to H. Res. 655 .
On October 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4324 Amendment SA 4324 proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Frist. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.4324 Amendment SA 4324 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On May 11, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 417 - 3 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1550 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 10, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 106-133 .
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4324
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor