+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On August 1, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On July 31, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1550 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On July 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On November 22, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-293 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194.
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Pedro R. Pierluisi
Type:
Primary Sponsor