+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On August 20, 1974 in the House:
- Referred bill and veto message to House Appropriations Committee.
On August 8, 1974 in the House:
- Vetoed by President, H. Doc. 93-331.
On August 1, 1974 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 30, 1974 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 30, 1974 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to Senate amendment.
- Senate agreed to conference report, roll call #337 .
On July 30, 1974 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #418 .
On July 25, 1974 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 93-1227.
On July 24, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On July 22, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #324 .
- Motion to lay on table the motion to recommit the bill passed Senate, roll call #323 .
On July 16, 1974 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 93-1014.
On June 24, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On June 21, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #319 .
On June 18, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 93-1120.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor