+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-430 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 297.
On November 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On June 14, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor