+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H392-393)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1532.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H392-394)
- Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-513.
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor