+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Public law 94-447.
On September 27, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 23, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 22, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 22, 1976 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On September 17, 1976 in the House:
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #750 .
On September 14, 1976 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1537.
On September 13, 1976 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On September 10, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #581 .
On August 27, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendments, S. Rept. 94-1185.
On August 26, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On August 25, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #659 .
- Motion to recommit to Committee on Appropriations with instructions rejected in House, roll call #658 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On August 12, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-1425.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor