+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On October 25, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 27, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Legislative and Budget Process.
On April 25, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On April 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On April 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Rules
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Rules, and Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor