+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 6, 1988 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 3, 1988 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 611.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. Report No: 100-51 .
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Space Science and Applications Discharged.
On April 9, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-51 .
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 26, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 12, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Space Science and Applications.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On March 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor