+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Garcia. Petition No: 113-9. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1751-1753)
On October 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
On October 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, Ways and Means, Armed Services, Natural Resources, Agriculture, Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, Oversight and Government Reform, the Budget, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (196)
Type:
Primary Sponsor