+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 24, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 573.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-882 .
On November 7, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans Discharged.
On October 16, 2007 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 16, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, and Oceans.
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor