+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 19, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 105-94.
On November 10, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 9, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On October 29, 1997 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 414 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On October 28, 1997 in the House:
- Mr. Kim moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Traficant objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
On July 31, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 80.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 105-226 .
On July 23, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1997 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 12, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Economic Development.
On April 29, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor