+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On December 8, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-184.
- Signed by President.
On November 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On November 24, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 20, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 20, 1987 in the Senate:
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1198 Amendment SP 1198 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.1198 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Levin. To improve the bill.
On October 22, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
- Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-206.
On October 19, 1987 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 1036 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On April 8, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On April 7, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-29 .
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 33.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 30, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-29 .
On March 25, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On March 19, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 18, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.1198
To improve the bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor