+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 18, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-397.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 6, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 29, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 28, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1472 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Marchant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 21, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor