+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-264.
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On January 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendments.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On December 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3442 Amendment SA 3442 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Burr. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.3442 Amendment SA 3442 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.3443 Amendment SA 3443 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Burr. To amend the title.
- S.AMDT.3443 Amendment SA 3443 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On September 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 11, 2012 in the House:
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1464 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.3442
In the nature of a substitute.
S.AMDT.3443
To amend the title.
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor