+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On December 6, 2006 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1458 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 24, 2006 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 10, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property.
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor