+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 25, 2021 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-37.
- Signed by President.
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 9, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5990)
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5990)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-31.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 16.
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2212-2215)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1448.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 1448 are considered vacated.
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981.(consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2240)
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2240)
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Stivers.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (316)
Type:
Primary Sponsor