+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On October 27, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-64.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 13, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 13, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-1340.
On September 20, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 19, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On August 4, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 95-1440.
On January 4, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor