+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 114-82. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 26, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7366)
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 260.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6200)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1442.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6200-6201)
- Mr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor