+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On May 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On May 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning.
On April 30, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
On April 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
On April 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House House Administration
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Government Reform, Banking and Financial Services, House Administration, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor