+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 114-126. (TXT | PDF)
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H694)
- Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H694)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 356.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment. Without written report.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On October 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 114-294, Part I.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1428.
- Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6985-6988)
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6985-6986)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 16, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice Discharged.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House