+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- See H.R.3030 .
On April 28, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
On March 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance.
On March 16, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Science, Research and Technology.
On March 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Conservation Credit and Rural Development.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Cotton, Rice, and Sugar.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Wheat, Soybeans, and Feed Grains.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On March 10, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On March 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor