+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-106. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7226)
On November 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8761)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1424.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8761-8763)
- Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor