+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 14, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-387.
- Signed by President.
On August 9, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On August 5, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On August 5, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On August 4, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On August 4, 1976 in the Senate:
- Senate receded and concurred in certain House amendments to certain Senate amendments.
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On August 3, 1976 in the House:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #591 .
On July 22, 1976 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-1361.
On July 19, 1976 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On July 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #382 .
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 30, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendment, S. Rept. 94-1017.
On June 29, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On June 28, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #470 .
- Motion to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations rejected in House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On June 8, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-1221.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor