+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1902-1903)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1423.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1902-1904)
- Mr. Lankford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H1902)
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 263.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-355.
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor