+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 22, 1974 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On November 19, 1974 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On October 1, 1974 in the Senate:
- Measure by unanimous consent was reconsidered and repassed in Senate amended.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 3378 .
- Committee on Labor and Public Welfare discharged in Senate.
On July 15, 1974 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Labor and Public Welfare.
On July 11, 1974 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #375 .
On June 20, 1974 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce with amendment, H. Rept. 93-1127.
On April 11, 1974 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor