+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 23, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-221 , Part I.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On July 12, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Natural Resources