+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On August 4, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-48.
- Signed by President.
On July 25, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 21, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 21, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On July 19, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 95-1017.
On May 19, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On May 17, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On May 5, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 95-250.
On January 4, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor