+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 1986 in the House:
- See H.R.4800 .
On June 26, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On May 31, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On April 3, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, Custom, s, ITC, USTR.
On March 18, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On March 5, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor