+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 20, 1989 in the House:
- See H.R.901 .
On July 31, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans requested executive comment from the Department of Veterans Affairs.
On June 22, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans. Hearings held.
On June 7, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
On June 6, 1989 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The chair announced that a second on the motion to suspend the rules is not required.
- Mr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 1, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 43.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 101-73.
On May 17, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 16, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from VA.
On May 11, 1989 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 18, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs.
On March 20, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from VA.
On March 15, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor