+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 28, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 66.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 107-77 , Part II.
On June 20, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 23, 2001 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on the Judiciary for a period ending not later than July 9, 2001 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 107-77 , Part I.
On May 16, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor