+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 350 - 71 (Roll no. 130). (text: 04/19/2021 CR H1939-1941)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 350 - 71 (Roll no. 130).(text: 04/19/2021 CR H1939-1941)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2032)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1392.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1939-1942)
- Mr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor