+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-26.
On July 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On July 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 424 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Mr. Miller moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 1383 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.580 Amendment SA 580 proposed by Senator Whitehouse for Senator Murray. To improve the bill.
- S.AMDT.580 Amendment SA 580 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Miller moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1383 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 389 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 112-81 . Filed late, pursuant to previous special order.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 42.
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 6.
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.580
To improve the bill.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor