+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 16, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-354.
- Signed by President.
On October 5, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 2, 2006 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 30, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 12, 2006 in the House:
- Mr. Jones moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 138 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 6, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 358.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 109-618 .
On July 19, 2006 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Fisheries and Oceans Discharged.
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On January 4, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor