+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Mr. Peterson.
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (311)
Type:
Primary Sponsor