+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-241.
- Signed by President.
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6840)
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1378.
- Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8898-8899)
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8898)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 99.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-406.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor