+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by President.
On October 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 14, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
- Cleared for White House
On October 14, 1978 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
On October 10, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 29, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means, H. Rept. 95-1669.
On August 8, 1978 in the House:
- Rereferred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
On August 2, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor