+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On November 12, 1991 in the House:
- See H.R.3575 .
On June 26, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On March 22, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 21, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 15, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On March 11, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor