+ − Summary
+ − Actions (19)
On October 17, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-522.
- Signed by President.
On October 6, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On October 5, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 30, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 30, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On September 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar in Senate.
- Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Intelligence, S. Rept. 94-1304.
On September 14, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.
On September 13, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #718 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On May 27, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-1152 .
On May 14, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
- Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1152.
On May 6, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor